Accounts and annual returns CREATIVE KIDS OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1087158
Charity reporting is overdue by 1602 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 871 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 871 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1236 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1236 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1602 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1602 days