ROY WOODWARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1087756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of grants to King Charles I School Kidderminster in respect of items not normally met by local education authority and subject there to the provision of grants to current and former pupils of the school for educational purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £63,411
Total expenditure: £102,293

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Gulliver Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Louise Rose Heath Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Joel Alan Douglas Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Stephen John Wyer Trustee 12 November 2020
JOHN BRECKNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PROVINCIAL GRAND CHAPTER OF WORCESTERSHIRE CHARITY FUND
Received: 81 days late
THE LESLIE AND IVY POUNTNEY BURSARY
Received: On time
ALAN JAMES NEAL Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record
LUCILLE GLENCAIRN CAMPBELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.58k £58.51k £60.37k £61.74k £63.41k
Total expenditure £67.64k £22.28k £91.73k £12.81k £102.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 March 2024 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ADAM HOUSE
BIRMINGHAM ROAD
KIDDERMINSTER
WORCESTERSHIRE
DY10 2SH
Phone:
01562820181
Website:

No information available