Financial history THE SOUTH WEST ACADEMY OF FINE AND APPLIED ARTS

Charity number: 1087350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £34.72k £36.36k £37.95k £21.60k £61.87k
Total expenditure £30.76k £37.15k £37.88k £22.50k £47.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A