Trustees THE SOUTH WEST ACADEMY OF FINE AND APPLIED ARTS

Charity number: 1087350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Norman Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
Geoffrey Shillito Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Alison Summerfield Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Simon Butler Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Andrew Baker Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
PHIL CREEK Trustee 09 August 2012
None on record