Accounts and annual returns EAST KENT FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1086473
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 March 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required