CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 1087321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required