CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 1087321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £23.27k £23.52k £38.45k £29.47k £32.01k
Total expenditure £12.14k £25.72k £58.68k £17.36k £9.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A