CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 1087321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Right Reverend Peter William Wheatley Chair 28 May 2015
ST LUKE'S HEALTHCARE FOR THE CLERGY Received: On time
THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY Received: On time
COMMUNITY OF ST MARY AT THE CROSS Received: On time
GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION Overdue by 331 days
MAUREEN ELIZABETH HARMAN Trustee 31 May 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY MAGDALEN AND ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA Received: On time
SARAH BRISCO CHARITY Received: On time
Paul Lewis Trustee 20 January 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE Received: On time
THE BATTLE CHARITIES Received: On time
Christopher Ian Curwen MacKellar Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Susan Parsons Trustee 20 January 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY MAGDALEN AND ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA Received: On time
Rev Nicholas Stewart Reade Trustee 28 February 2014 None on record