Trustees GROUNDSWELL NETWORK SUPPORT UK

Charity number: 1089987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Helen Kirby Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer Lynn Travassos Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Robert Andrew Frier Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Anthony Floyd McKenzie Trustee 11 May 2021
PEOPLE'S VOICE MEDIA
Received: On time
Gina Rowlands Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Louisa McDonald Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Jenny May Yates Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
Matthew Harrison Trustee 22 January 2015
None on record
STEPHEN WYLER Trustee 22 January 2015
None on record
Dr Alistair Story Trustee 15 October 2013
None on record