THE LEBANESE WELFARE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI TRUST

Charity number: 1092240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 18 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 July 2020 98 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 23 May 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 June 2018 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required