THE LEBANESE WELFARE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI TRUST

Charity number: 1092240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £16.23k £22.69k £35.04k £29.65k £39.01k
Total expenditure £23.29k £30.69k £36.18k £33.97k £37.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.41k