Accounts and annual returns 17TH NORWICH (ST GEORGE'S RC) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1086590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window