HILLINGDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1086758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

See Annual Report

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £53,627
Total expenditure: £63,755

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Ann Lines Chair 08 February 2016
None on record
Pauline Rees Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Cobb Bsc MBA Trustee 12 December 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE EASTCOTE
Received: On time
GAYNOR MASON Trustee 11 May 2022
1ST RUISLIP (FIELD MARSHAL LORD MILNE'S OWN) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
HILARY PLACE Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Christine Clare Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Margaret Stacey Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Richard Fremantle Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Freda Elizabeth Longhurst Trustee 01 April 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Patricia Mary Ann McAlpine Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
Judith Peddie Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record
PAMELA SMITH Trustee 16 August 2011
None on record
BARBARA HALL Trustee 16 August 2011
None on record
Harvey Butnick Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.64k £33.37k £17.13k £53.37k £53.63k
Total expenditure £40.23k £15.67k £19.76k £49.18k £63.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
91 Long Lane
Hillingdon
UXBRIDGE
UB10 0AP
Phone:
01895239232
Email:
No information available
Website:

u3asites.org.uk/hillingdon