GUJARATI LITERARY ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1087722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.96k £3.12k £5.30k £1.37k £523
Total expenditure £1.33k £3.59k £3.74k £921 £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A