INTERNATIONAL SOVEREIGN PENTECOSTAL CHURCH - COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 - raise funds, receive grants and donations 2 - apply funds to carry out the work of the charity 3 - co-operate with and support other charities with similar purposes 4 - do anything which is lawful and necessary to achieve the purposes 5 - Plan and organise religious and community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Canada
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- France
Governance
- 16 November 2001: Standard registration
- ISPC-CP (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL SWAHILI PENTECOSTAL CHURCH COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mania Tambwe | Chair | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yohali Niama-Tsiba | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tambwe Jacquie Kibanza | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wenga Tambwe | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £46.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £47.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 09 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 12 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY, THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST SWAHILIS, SWAHILI SPEAKING PERSONS OR PERSONS OF SWAHILI DESCENT RESIDENT OR INTENDING TO RESIDE IN GREATER LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES AND OTHER OTHER ASSISTANCE IN MATTERS SUCH AS HEALTH, HOUSING, WELFARE BENEFITS, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATION AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN LANGUAGES, LITERACY AND SUBJECTS; AND (3) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID AREA AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 VINCENT STREET
LONDON
E16 1LS
- Phone:
- 07548 909994
- Email:
- sovereign.ipc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window