Financial history DURHAM UNION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1094676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £130.59k £135.88k £119.74k £81.81k £74.10k
Total expenditure £131.81k £132.42k £121.58k £50.82k £79.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.90k N/A