MIKE THURSTON WATER ACTIVITIES CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing coaching in water activities (in particular canoeing) to young people, and the provision of camping facilities and equipment for water activities for youth organisations and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Belcher | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Harman | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Charles Molloy | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Langton | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL OSBORNE | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY DENNIS | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN LANGTON | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS DOT LANGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARRY RJ KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | £16.39k | £14.86k | £14.86k | £14.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £7.67k | £5.53k | £5.53k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £2.67k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 November 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 March 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 September 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 September 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2003. as amended on 13 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL. MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 NURSERY DRIVE
NORWICH ROAD
NORTH WALSHAM
NR28 0UW
- Phone:
- 01692402665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window