Accounts and annual returns TASSIBEE PROJECT

Charity number: 1091559
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 February 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 February 2019 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window