Financial history TASSIBEE PROJECT

Charity number: 1091559
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £195.17k £188.32k £211.60k £202.91k £353.97k
Total expenditure £156.52k £170.25k £170.26k £164.38k £233.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A