Accounts and annual returns SUNDERLAND HEADLIGHT

Charity number: 1090717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window