WHITEHALL ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1089558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.98k £18.28k £15.94k £14.42k £22.01k
Total expenditure £17.57k £15.19k £15.46k £22.30k £6.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A