RAMSGATE OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1091538
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)