RAMSGATE OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1091538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth Pickett Trustee 19 February 2019 None on record
Mary Pickett Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Paul Douglas Trindall Trustee 19 February 2020 None on record
Nathan Karro Trustee 03 March 2021 None on record
Thomas Mitchell Trustee 26 February 2021 None on record
Rhea Woodward Trustee 16 March 2021
ST MILDREDS PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Linda Sanford Trustee 26 February 2021 None on record
Barry Todd Trustee 15 February 2018 None on record