CMZ LTD

Charity number: 1087870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.00m £3.24m £3.42m £3.55m £3.94m
Total expenditure £2.88m £3.19m £3.42m £3.52m £3.78m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £3.23m £3.42m £3.55m £3.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.00m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £3.23m £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £14
Income - Other £0 £2.60k £0 £2.60k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £3.42m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.88m £3.17m £3.40m £3.52m £3.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £17.37k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.70k £0 £0 £13.64k £12.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.87m £3.17m £3.40m £2.91m £3.32m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £21.99k £0 £0 £0