LINKS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1088984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.27k £20.60k £24.91k £24.91k £6.31k
Total expenditure £21.44k £22.01k £25.71k £25.71k £4.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A