VALGRAY'S BORDER COLLIE AND ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1088503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £42.59k £38.43k £22.87k £96.70k £49.26k
Total expenditure £8.74k £35.48k £29.03k £68.60k £18.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A