Accounts and annual returns ST HELENS CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1089663
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window