Financial history AFRICAN HEALTH POLICY NETWORK

Charity number: 1088641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £98.47k £82.36k £92.86k £142.38k £697.38k
Total expenditure £101.67k £79.76k £95.66k £135.00k £448.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £13.66k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £697.38k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £442.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £327.92k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0