Financial history THE TOM ACTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1088069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £5.05k £0 £7.36k £0
Total expenditure £30 £4.78k £1.00k £7.13k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A