ST COLUMBA'S COLLEGE AND PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1088480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download