ST COLUMBA'S COLLEGE AND PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1088480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.33m £11.21m £11.72m £11.98m £11.59m
Total expenditure £10.28m £11.77m £11.09m £11.12m £10.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £199.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £113.17k £217.40k £149.20k £135.96k £195.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.19m £11.21m £11.55m £11.81m £11.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.64k £24.48k £24.41k £35.39k £42.62k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £199.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.21m £11.75m £11.06m £11.06m £10.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £65.86k £19.49k £22.83k £61.06k £89.70k
Expenditure - Governance £17.07k £0 £21.59k £21.59k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £49.86k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0