ST COLUMBA'S COLLEGE AND PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1088480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Robert Johnson Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Robert Duigan Trustee 01 September 2012 None on record
Angela Gray Trustee 01 March 2013 None on record
Bradley Hutchinson Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Nicola Lloyd Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Stephen Watson Trustee 01 September 2012 None on record
Kevin Paul Doran Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Brother Ronald Joseph Hingle Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Brother Ivy LeBlanc Trustee 01 September 2006 None on record
Barbara Margaret Elliott Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Oliver James Adams Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Br Joseph Francis Holthaus Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Kevin McGovern Trustee 30 November 2015 None on record