FR. JAMES TEELING, TREVOR HORN AND JILL SINCLAIR (PHILIPPINE CHILDREN) TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the development and care of needy children in the Philippines in regard to their physical, mental, spiritual and general development and any other charitable objects for the benefit of needy children as may be decided by the trustees. This financial year the charity donated -ú23,606 to Ateneo Casa Famiglia Servants of the Poor and Mater Orphanorum Servants of the Poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Philippines
Governance
- 28 September 2001: Standard registration
- SAJM TRUST FUND (Working name)
- JILL SINCLAIR AND FR. JIM TEELING (PHILIPPINE CHILDREN) TRUST FUND AND JSJT TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- ST ANNE AND ST JOACHIM (PHILIPPINE CHILDREN) TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES TEELING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DR GABRIEL IVBIJARO | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL SCOTLAND | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
AARON THOMAS HORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.98k | £8.95k | £4.86k | £3.11k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £7.03k | £209 | £7.06k | £6.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 December 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 2 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 14 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 01 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF NEEDY CHILDREN IN THE PHILIPPINES PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
JTJ Trust Fund
105 Ladbroke Grove
LONDON
W11 1PG
- Phone:
- 02072291229
- Email:
- jsjttrustfund@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window