Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S AFRICAN AID

Charity number: 1087768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 04 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 23 July 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 23 July 2019 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window