Financial history ST JOSEPH'S AFRICAN AID

Charity number: 1087768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £56.73k £97.93k £74.41k £149.88k £53.63k
Total expenditure £153.56k £141.75k £105.71k £128.32k £69.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A