Trustees ST JOSEPH'S AFRICAN AID

Charity number: 1087768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denzil Mascarenhas Chair 18 January 2019
None on record
Pauline Janice Carter Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record
Lisa Jane Goring Trustee 22 January 2021
None on record
SAMANTHA HOLLY TURNER Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
Dr Joan Olivia Davies Trustee 20 January 2015
None on record