CO-OPERATIVE COMMUNITY INVESTMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.54m £1.70m £5.08m £4.34m £3.39m
Total expenditure £591.00k £1.19m £3.74m £4.02m £3.93m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £206.85k £2.00m £2.51m £30.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.07m £1.11m £4.72m £3.97m £3.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £121.60k £206.85k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £346.22k £376.83k £363.66k £374.61k £308.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £589.20k £1.19m £3.74m £4.02m £3.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.79k £596 £789 £218 £15.47k
Expenditure - Governance £17.13k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £497.56k £982.67k £3.02m £3.05m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0