CO-OPERATIVE COMMUNITY INVESTMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jamie Antoney Ward-Smith Chair 22 September 2016 None on record
Saleem Chowdhery Trustee 30 June 2016 None on record
Sharon Ann Jones Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Lois McClure Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
SARAH WOODCOCK Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Daniel Crowe Trustee 01 August 2016
WHITLEY BAY BIG LOCAL Received: On time
SHEILA JANE MALLEY Trustee 10 October 2016
ROSA FUND Received: On time