Financial history EYESIGHT

Charity number: 1091084
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2018 01/06/2019 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022
Total gross income £4.26k £1.80k £282 £524 £810
Total expenditure £1.11k £901 £2.06k £0 £20
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A