COALEY VILLAGE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1088208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 17 October 2016 On time Download