THE DU BOISSON DANCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1088916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £110.95k £100.83k £296.45k £324.08k £197.90k
Total expenditure £229.04k £195.48k £287.52k £327.89k £270.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A