THE DU BOISSON DANCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1088916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNA DU BOISSON Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
WILLIAM WAKE Trustee None on record
Bharat Azad Trustee 03 February 2021 None on record
James Ghani Trustee 17 February 2021 None on record
Nikki Studt Trustee 13 March 2019 None on record
Yasuhiro Yamaguchi Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
Georgina Louise Black Chair 13 August 2021 None on record