THE FRIENDS OF BOLTON LE SANDS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for enhancement of pupil's learning. To support the school and make charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Parkinson | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hudspith | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen O'hagan | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hargreaves | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/08/2019 | 14/08/2020 | 14/08/2021 | 14/08/2022 | 14/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £6.73k | £10.67k | £19.05k | £7.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.34k | £8.72k | £9.96k | £14.19k | £2.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 August 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 August 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:- A) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING B) FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND MUTUAL SUPPORT BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bolton le Sands C of E Primary Scho
Mount Pleasant Lane
Bolton le Sands
CARNFORTH
LA5 8DT
- Phone:
- 01524823606
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window