Financial history QUOTHQUAN HOMES

Charity number: 1096639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £122.03k £120.96k £115.05k £117.20k £117.72k
Total expenditure £65.12k £70.85k £64.23k £92.59k £63.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A