Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TRINITY ST PETER'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2021 31 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2018 04 January 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2017 Not Required