Financial history FRIENDS OF TRINITY ST PETER'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/10/2017 20/10/2018 20/10/2019 20/10/2020 20/10/2021
Total gross income £7.09k £12.33k £12.40k £2.77k £10.53k
Total expenditure £3.50k £24.36k £13.90k £1.95k £7.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A