IEDARA TALEEM-UN-NISA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Iedara Taleem-un-Nisa has established a school for the primary and secondary education of underprivileged girls in Lahore since 2001. The school follows a curriculum approved by the Punjab Board of Education. Three hundred and fifty girls are getting their education in this school. The charity also organises educational events for the local women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pakistan
Governance
- 28 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hamid Jalal | Chair | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ather Aziz | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIAZ AHMED | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.56k | £27.56k | £83.68k | £49.16k | £27.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.60k | £23.61k | £82.11k | £46.55k | £16.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2001 as amended on 31 May 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF UNDERPRIVILEGED GIRLS IN PAKISTAN. 2) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF UNDERPRIVILEGED GIRLS IN PAKISTAN, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF START-UP GRANTS FOR SMALL BUSINESSES.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ivy Cottage
Ivy Lane
Elton
Matlock
Derbyshire
DE4 2BX
- Phone:
- 07940485595
- Email:
- jalalhamid@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window