EAST LONDON BRASS

Charity number: 1091235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £20.05k £13.65k £21.65k £17.46k £16.21k
Total expenditure £17.57k £15.73k £13.74k £14.76k £21.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £244 N/A N/A N/A