Trustees FRIENDS OF SABEEL UK (FOSUK)
Charity number: 1116817

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Howard | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Valerie Lesley Dawson | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Malcolm Woodall | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lynn McAllister | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kate Aspinwall | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARY JENNIFER RICHARDSON BSC MA | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Fairfax-Cholmeley | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Miranda Pinch | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.