BRITISH-SERBIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising and sponsoring professional meetings/symposia; sponsoring individuals for further professional study; providing advice/information pertinent to health sciences and practice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Serbia
Governance
- 24 August 2001: Standard registration
- BRITISH YUGOSLAV MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- MEDICUS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ZIKA PETROVIC MD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Zarko Stefan | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR Aleksandra Fox | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Mirjana Petrovic | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikac Tomanovic | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £750 | £90 | £0 | £0 | £2.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £271 | £91 | £507 | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 2001, AS AMENDED 15 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 2002, 6 DECEMBER 2003 AND 9 DECEMBER 2006. as amended on 13 Jan 2012 as amended on 25 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
247A OLD DOVER ROAD
CANTERBURY
CT1 3ES
- Phone:
- 01227450796
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window